Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Paolo Lettieri

Deceased

Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1808BornFoggia
16 Jun 183223.6Ordained PriestPriest
6 Mar 185546.3SelectedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
23 Mar 185546.4ConfirmedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
13 May 185546.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
24 Jun 186960.6DiedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Paolo Lettieri:
Bishop Francesco Paolo Lettieri (born , died ) Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1861
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013