Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillo Letizia, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tricarico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1798³BornNapoli
21 Sep 182224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
8 Feb 183839.4SelectedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
13 Sep 183840.0ConfirmedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
Oct 1838³40.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tricarico, Italy
5 Aug 185960.9DiedBishop of Tricarico, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Camillo Letizia
Bishop Camillo Letizia C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Tricarico

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 377
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1838, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Aug 2016