Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lelio Valentino Contessini-Ettorio

Deceased

Bishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1680Born
20 Mar 170626.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 172949.7AppointedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia
30 Nov 172949.7Ordained BishopBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia
Mar 1732³52.0DiedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lelio Valentino Contessini-Ettorio
Bishop Lelio Valentino Contessini-Ettorio (born , died Mar 1732) Bishop of Pula (Pola)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIsola

  • a priest for 25.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 318
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast