Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clemente Comenge Avio

Deceased

Bishop of Ciudad Rodrigo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1676BornMonegrillo
3 Mar 173861.9AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
4 May 173862.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
12 Dec 174771.7DiedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Clemente Comenge Avio:
Bishop Clemente Comenge Avio (born , died ) Bishop of Ciudad Rodrigo

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,492

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013