Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Lanfranchi, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ugento, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Dec 1650AppointedBishop of Ugento, Italy
8 Jan 1651Ordained BishopBishop of Ugento, Italy
1659¹DiedBishop of Ugento, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrea Lanfranchi
Bishop Andrea Lanfranchi C.R. (died 1659) Bishop of Ugento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSan Silvestro in Monte Cavallo, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 351
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,651, Number 4
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,135
  • ob/c2+: AT, 9 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Number 20,263

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast