Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Vicente Lamadrid

Deceased

Bishop of Málaga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1736Born
11 Aug 180063.6AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
16 Nov 180063.9Ordained BishopBishop of Málaga, Spain
9 Mar 1809³72.2DiedBishop of Málaga, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Vicente Lamadrid
Bishop José Vicente Lamadrid (born , died ) Bishop of Málaga

EventPlace
Birth PlacePotes

  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,800, Number 20
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,888
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,364
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 250
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 119, Number 628

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast