Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wojciech Tolibowski

Deceased

Bishop of Poznań


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1607¹Born
2 May 164437.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
2 May 164437.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lacedaemonia
1 Jan 164538.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lacedaemonia
2 Aug 165548.6AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
22 Jul 166356.6DiedBishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wojciech Tolibowski:
Bishop Wojciech Tolibowski (died ) Bishop of Poznań

  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 213, and Page 287
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,942

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 14 Jan 2014