Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Kurio

Deceased

Bishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1875Born
9 Sep 190025.4Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 194166.6AppointedBishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
1 Feb 194266.7Ordained BishopBishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
24 Apr 194671.0DiedBishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Jean Kurio
Bishop Jean Kurio (born , died ) Bishop of Amadiyah

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlquosh

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,370
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast