Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Joseph Schüller von Ehrenthal

Deceased

Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}

Titular Bishop of Danaba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1738BornOstritz
7 Mar 176122.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
20 Dec 176123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
9 Oct 178041.9AppointedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
18 Jul 178344.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Danaba
21 Sep 178344.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Danaba
14 Sep 179455.8DiedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Joseph Schüller von Ehrenthal:
Bishop Johann Joseph Schüller von Ehrenthal (born , died ) Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}

  • a priest for 32.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,905
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 192, and Page 455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 1 Jan 2016