Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Chrön (Krein)

Deceased

Bishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1560¹Born
29 Mar 159939.2AppointedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
12 Sep 159939.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
10 Feb 163070.1DiedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Chrön (Krein) (VIAF: 8474988)
Bishop Thomas Chrön (Krein) (born 1560, died ) Bishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Agyd, Graz
Death PlaceOberleg

  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 213
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 217
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast