Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michal Franciszek Karpowicz, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Wigry


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1744BornKamieniec
29 Jul 176116.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
1767²22.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
28 Mar 179954.4AppointedBishop of Wigry, Poland
30 Mar 180055.4Ordained BishopBishop of Wigry, Poland
5 Nov 180359.0DiedBishop of Wigry, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michal Franciszek Karpowicz:
Bishop Michal Franciszek Karpowicz C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Wigry

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1800, Number 3
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,025
  • prof/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015