Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Assalhit, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alet


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Feb 1418AppointedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
23 Aug 1419AppointedBishop of Condom, France
8 Jan 1421AppointedBishop of Alet, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre Assalhit:
Bishop Pierre Assalhit O.S.A. , Bishop of Alet

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 202, and Page 377
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 237
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 149

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Aug 2014