Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Philippe de Cotquis

Deceased

Archbishop of Tours, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1376¹Born
16 Oct 141943.7AppointedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Lon, France
17 Mar 142246.2InstalledBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Lon, France
30 Jul 142751.5AppointedArchbishop of Tours, France
17 Mar 143660.2InstalledArchbishop of Tours, France
12 Jul 144165.5DiedArchbishop of Tours, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philippe de Cotquis (VIAF: 170125946)
Archbishop Philippe de Cotquis (born 1376, died ) Archbishop of Tours

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHouse of Kerneguez, Morlaix
Death PlaceTours, Archdiocese of Tours

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast