Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Sánchez y Jiménez (Rubio), O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ávila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1781BornAlía
16 Sep 184766.0SelectedBishop of Osma, Spain
17 Dec 184766.3ConfirmedBishop of Osma, Spain
27 Feb 184866.5Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
11 Jul 185270.8SelectedBishop of Ávila, Spain
27 Sep 185271.0ConfirmedBishop of Ávila, Spain
17 Feb 185472.4DiedBishop of Ávila, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Sánchez y Jiménez (Rubio):
Bishop Gregorio Sánchez y Jiménez (Rubio) O.S.H. (born , died ) Bishop of Ávila

  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 70, and Page 432
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 152, Number 833

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014