Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Gaetano Incontri

Deceased

Bishop of Volterra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1773BornVolterra
17 Dec 179623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Volterra, Italy
6 Oct 180632.9AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
12 Oct 180632.9Ordained BishopBishop of Volterra, Italy
15 Apr 184874.4DiedBishop of Volterra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Gaetano Incontri:
Bishop Giuseppe Gaetano Incontri (born , died ) Bishop of Volterra

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 399

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013