Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Hou Jin-de

Deceased

Bishop of Xingtai [Shunteh], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1920Born
1945²24.9Ordained PriestPriest
28 Oct 198969.7Ordained BishopBishop of Xingtai [Shunteh], China
20 May 199474.3DiedBishop of Xingtai [Shunteh], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Hou Jin-de
Bishop Joseph Hou Jin-de (born , died ) Bishop of Xingtai [Shunteh]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopWeixian

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,120
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,586
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast