Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert von Haller

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chur

Titular Bishop of Carrhae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1808BornBern
29 Mar 183425.7Ordained PriestPriest of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
18 Mar 185849.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chur, Switzerland
18 Mar 185849.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Carrhae
29 Jun 185849.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carrhae
28 Nov 185850.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chur, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Albert von Haller:
Bishop Albert von Haller (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chur

  • a priest for 24.7 years
  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 184

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013