Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Antoine (Maxime) Guisolan, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lausanne, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1735Born
175317.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
20 May 175823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
26 Mar 180469.0AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
6 May 180469.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
9 Dec 181479.7DiedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Antoine (Maxime) Guisolan
Bishop Joseph-Antoine (Maxime) Guisolan O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Lausanne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChénens

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1804, Number 10
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 233
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018