Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Gravesend

Deceased

Bishop of London, England


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Sep 1318SelectedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
3 Nov 1318ConfirmedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
14 Jan 1319Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
8 Apr 1338DiedBishop of London, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Stephen Gravesend:
Bishop Stephen Gravesend (died ) Bishop of London

  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 311
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 72
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 290

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013