Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Cobham

Deceased

Bishop of Worcester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Mar 1317AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
22 May 1317Ordained BishopBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
27 Aug 1327DiedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Cobham:
Bishop Thomas Cobham (died ) Bishop of Worcester

  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 529
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 71
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013