Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Walter Reynolds

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Jan 1308SelectedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
13 Oct 1308Ordained BishopBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
1 Oct 1313AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
16 Nov 1327DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Walter Reynolds:
Archbishop Walter Reynolds (died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 163, and Page 528
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 70
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 16
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013