Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Drokensford

Deceased

Bishop of Bath and Wells, England


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Feb 1309SelectedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
9 Nov 1309Ordained BishopBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
9 May 1329DiedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Drokensford:
Bishop John Drokensford (died ) Bishop of Bath and Wells

  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 130
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 70
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013