Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Langton

Deceased

Bishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Apr 1305SelectedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
19 Sep 1305Ordained BishopBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
17 Jun 1337DiedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Langton
Bishop John Langton (died ) Bishop of Chichester

  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 187
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 70
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast