Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Damián Gordo Sáez

Deceased

Bishop of Tortosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1796BornCantalojas
16 Mar 184852.2SelectedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
3 Jul 184852.5ConfirmedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
22 Oct 184852.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tortosa, Spain
24 Dec 185458.9DiedBishop of Tortosa, Spain

MicroData Summary for Damián Gordo Sáez:
Bishop Damián Gordo Sáez (born , died ) Bishop of Tortosa

  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,419
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 243
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 157, Number 859

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013