Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guitard de Ratte

Deceased

Bishop of Montpellier, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1552¹Born
26 Mar 159745.2AppointedBishop of Montpellier, France
29 Jun 159745.4Ordained BishopBishop of Montpellier, France
7 Aug 160250.5DiedBishop of Montpellier, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guitard de Ratte (VIAF: 38722061)
Bishop Guitard de Ratte (born 1552, died ) Bishop of Montpellier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontpellier, Diocese of Montpellier
Ordained BishopCelestins, Church, Paris, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceToulouse

  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 248
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 232
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1597, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast