Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matteo Brumani, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1545¹Born
4 Mar 158742.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicomedia
13 Nov 159146.8AppointedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
9 Aug 159449.6DiedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matteo Brumani (VIAF: 49173566)
Bishop Matteo Brumani C.R.S.A. (born 1545, died ) Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 257, and Page 241
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1587, Number 6*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast