Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Filippo Cardinal Spinola

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nola, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1535Born
8 Feb 156630.1AppointedBishop of Bisignano, Italy
17 Feb 156630.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bisignano, Italy
9 Mar 156933.2AppointedBishop of Nola, Italy
12 Dec 158348.0Elevated to Cardinal
20 Feb 158448.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
1585²49.0AppointedAdministrator of Sora, Italy
1 Jul 158549.5ResignedBishop of Nola, Italy
1 Jul 158549.5ResignedAdministrator of Sora, Italy
20 Aug 159357.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Nola, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Filippo Spinola (VIAF: 171599813)
Filippo Cardinal Spinola (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenoa, Archdiocese of Genova
Ordained BishopPauline, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Santa Sabina, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Current)Tomb of his ancestors, Genoa, Archdiocese of Genova

  • a bishop for 27.5 years
  • a cardinal for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1583
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 260, and Page 134
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 8, Number 9
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1566, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast