Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Gisulfo e Osorio

Deceased

Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1602¹Born
21 Nov 165048.8AppointedBishop of Cefalù, Italy
30 Nov 165048.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalù, Italy
30 Sep 165856.7AppointedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
Dec 1664³62.9DiedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Gisulfo e Osorio
Bishop Francesco Gisulfo e Osorio (born 1602, died Dec 1664) Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo

  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 146, and Page 73
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1650, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast