Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Giacci

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Marsi, Italy

Titular Bishop of Philomelium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1855Born
22 Dec 187722.7Ordained PriestPriest of Frascati, Italy
3 Oct 190045.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Frascati, Italy
3 Oct 190045.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Nyssa
7 Oct 190045.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nyssa
13 Jul 190449.2AppointedBishop of Marsi, Italy
29 Apr 190954.0ResignedBishop of Marsi, Italy
29 Apr 190954.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Philomelium
20 Feb 192973.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Marsi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Giacci
Bishop Francesco Giacci (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Marsi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRocca Priora

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 422
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 242
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1928, Page 300
  • d: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 21, Page 128

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast