Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cesare Cardinal Gherardi

Deceased

Bishop of Camerino

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1577²BornFossato di Vico
1618²41.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jan 162144.0Elevated to Cardinal
3 Mar 162144.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
2 May 162245.3AppointedBishop of Camerino, Italy
22 May 162245.3Ordained BishopBishop of Camerino, Italy
30 Sep 162346.7DiedBishop of Camerino, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cesare Gherardi:
Cesare Cardinal Gherardi (died ) Bishop of Camerino

  • a priest for 5.7 years
  • a bishop for 1.3 years
  • a cardinal for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Jan 1621
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 14, and Page 131
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 76, Number 447
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1622, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 22 Feb 2015