Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesare Ventimiglia

Deceased

Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1573¹BornBenevento
31 Dec 161442.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jan 161542.0AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
25 Mar 161542.2Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
23 Dec 164573.0DiedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cesare Ventimiglia:
Bishop Cesare Ventimiglia (died ) Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

  • a priest for 31.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 330
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 57, Number 328

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013