Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pascual López Estaún (Estac)

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1707³BornSanta Olaria
17 Nov 175548.1AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
6 Jan 175648.3Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
15 Apr 177668.5AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
10 Oct 178982.0DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pascual López Estaún (Estac):
Bishop Pascual López Estaún (Estac) (born , died ) Bishop of Huesca

  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,170
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 239
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,883
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 74, Number 359

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 26 Oct 2013