Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Manuel Merino y Lumbreras

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1710³BornLumbreras
1 Jun 176756.9AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
19 Jul 176757.0Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
5 Aug 178272.1DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Manuel Merino y Lumbreras:
Bishop Juan Manuel Merino y Lumbreras (born , died ) Bishop of Astorga

  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 85, Number 428
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 104
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015