Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Pietro Galletti, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1711Born
21 Nov 173422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
22 Aug 176351.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia
15 Sep 176351.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia
12 Nov 177563.8DiedTitular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Pietro Galletti
Bishop Giovanni Pietro Galletti O.S.B. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 96
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 Jan 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,763, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast