Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Alagona

Deceased

Bishop of Siracusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1726BornSiracusa
14 Mar 175023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Siracusa, Italy
16 Jul 177346.8SelectedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
13 Sep 177347.0ConfirmedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
31 Oct 177347.1Ordained BishopBishop of Siracusa, Italy
Sep 1801³75.0DiedBishop of Siracusa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Alagona:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Alagona (born , died Sep 1801) Bishop of Siracusa

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 390
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Dec 2015