Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Galindo Sanz, O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Orense


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1701BornVillar de los Navarros
4 May 176462.5AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
24 Jun 176462.7Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
23 Feb 176967.3DiedBishop of Orense, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Galindo Sanz:
Bishop Francisco Galindo Sanz O.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Orense

  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 81, Number 407

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013