Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Javier Rodríguez Arellano

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1704³BornSangüesa
20 Aug 176460.4AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
28 Oct 176460.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
1 Jun 179187.2DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Javier Rodríguez Arellano:
Archbishop José Javier Rodríguez Arellano (born , died ) Archbishop of Burgos

  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 81, Number 410
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 39
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015