Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bérenger Cardinal de Frédol (Jr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateEventTitle
1309²SelectedBishop of Béziers, France
29 May 1309ConfirmedBishop of Béziers, France
23 Dec 1312AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
23 Dec 1312Elevated to Cardinal
22 Aug 1317AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
Nov 1323³DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bérenger de Frédol (Jr.):
Cardinal Bérenger de Frédol (Jr.) , Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

  • a cardinal for 10.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Dec 312
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 36, and Page 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 31 Dec 2013