Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Berenguer Battle

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Sep 1320AppointedBishop of Elne, France
Oct 1320²Ordained BishopBishop of Elne, France
27 Jul 1332AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
1 Nov 1349DiedBishop of Mallorca, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Berenguer Battle:
Bishop Berenguer Battle (died ) Bishop of Mallorca

  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 323, and Page 238
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,015
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1500, Page 302, Number 143

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015