Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bertrand Cardinal de La Tour, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1265¹BornCamboulit
3 Sep 132055.7AppointedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
21 Oct 132055.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
20 Dec 132056.0Elevated to Cardinal
20 Dec 132056.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
30 Apr 132156.3ResignedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
Jun 1323²58.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
1333¹68.0DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bertrand de La Tour:
Bertrand Cardinal de La Tour O.F.M. , Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
  • a cardinal for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1320
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,848

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 28 Jan 2014