Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Aicardo Antimiano, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Sep 1317AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
10 Aug 1339³DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aicardo Antimiano:
Archbishop Aicardo Antimiano O.F.M. (died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 332
  • ob/c2: CB, 30 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 31 Dec 2013