Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guido de Terrena, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Elne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Apr 1321AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
10 May 1321Ordained BishopBishop of Mallorca, Spain
27 Jul 1332AppointedBishop of Elne, France
21 Aug 1342DiedBishop of Elne, France

MicroData Summary for Guido de Terrena
Bishop Guido de Terrena O. Carm. (died ) Bishop of Elne

  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 323, and Page 238
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,856
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 302, Number 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast