Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola , O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Argos


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Feb 1323AppointedBishop of Drivasto (Drivost), Albania
18 Mar 1323Ordained BishopBishop of Drivasto (Drivost), Albania
17 Dec 1324AppointedBishop of Argos, Greece
1334²DiedBishop of Argos, Greece

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola :
Bishop Nicola O.S.A. , Bishop of Argos

  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Number 18,201
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 227, and Page 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 Aug 2014