Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Veit von Fraunberg

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Dec 1563SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
21 Jun 1564ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
3 Sep 1564Ordained BishopBishop of Regensburg, Germany
21 Jan 1567DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Veit von Fraunberg (VIAF: 77389753)
Bishop Veit von Fraunberg (died ) Bishop of Regensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoxau
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria

  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1564, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 282

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast