Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Courtenay

Deceased

Bishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Sep 1478ConfirmedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
8 Nov 1478Ordained BishopBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
29 Jan 1487AppointedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
22 Sep 1492DiedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Peter Courtenay (VIAF: 86319175)
Bishop Peter Courtenay (died ) Bishop of Winchester

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Etienne, Church, Westminster

  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 376
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 152, and Page 269
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 15
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 93
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1478, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 27 Nov 2018

Quantcast