Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Livio Podocatharo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Nicosia, Cyprus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1474¹Born
5 Oct 152450.7AppointedArchbishop of Nicosia, Cyprus
24 Feb 1527³53.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Nicosia, Cyprus
1552¹78.0ResignedArchbishop of Nicosia, Cyprus
13 Feb 155581.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Nicosia, Cyprus

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Livio Podocatharo
Archbishop Livio Podocatharo (born 1474, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Nicosia

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 258
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1527, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Jun 2018

Quantcast