Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Niccol˛ Forti

Deceased

Bishop of Pescia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1799Born
21 Sep 182222.7Ordained PriestPriest of Pescia, Italy
12 Apr 184747.3AppointedBishop of Pescia, Italy
18 Apr 184747.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pescia, Italy
13 Apr 185454.3DiedBishop of Pescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Niccol˛ Forti
Bishop Pietro Niccol˛ Forti (born , died ) Bishop of Pescia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePescia
Ordained BishopSanti XII Apostoli, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 31.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 456
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,847, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast