Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvatore Ventimiglia, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Catania

Titular Archbishop of Nicomedia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1721BornPalermo
16 Aug 174423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
19 Nov 175736.3SelectedBishop of Catania, Italy
19 Dec 175736.4ConfirmedBishop of Catania, Italy
27 Dec 175736.4Ordained BishopBishop of Catania, Italy
11 Dec 177150.4ResignedBishop of Catania, Italy
16 Dec 177150.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia
8 Apr 179775.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Catania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Ventimiglia:
Archbishop Salvatore Ventimiglia C.O. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Catania

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 39.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 156, and Page 309
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 20 Nov 2015