Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giambattista Pensa

Deceased

Bishop of Fossano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1704BornMonreale
20 Sep 172723.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Dec 172824.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 174136.6SelectedBishop of Fossano, Italy
17 Apr 174136.7ConfirmedBishop of Fossano, Italy
23 Apr 174136.7Ordained BishopBishop of Fossano, Italy
1 Jun 175449.8DiedBishop of Fossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Pensa
Bishop Giambattista Pensa (born , died ) Bishop of Fossano

  • a priest for 25.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 219
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 22 Jun 2016