Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Francisco Jiménez (Ximenes), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

Bishop of Elne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1330¹Born
13 Nov 140878.8AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
16 Nov 140878.8Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
19 Dec 140878.9AppointedBishop of Elne, France
13 Jan 140979.0DiedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Jiménez (Ximenes)
Patriarch Francisco Jiménez (Ximenes) O.F.M. (born 1330, died ) Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGerona
Ordained BishopPerpignan, Diocese of Elne, France

  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 276
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,197
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,017
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 306, Number 179
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 759

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast